From The Dreadnought Project
Jump to navigationJump to search
Name
|
Born
|
Died
|
Date of Promotion
|
Age on Promotion
|
Retired
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
Officers promoted to the rank of Captain in 1875
|
Henry Frederick Stephenson, C.B.
|
7 June, 1842
|
|
6 January
|
32
|
|
Harry Woodfall Brent
|
19 August, 1834
|
|
27 April
|
40
|
|
Frederic Proby Doughty
|
28 July, 1834
|
|
14 May
|
40
|
|
Charles George Fane
|
14 November, 1837
|
|
9 August
|
|
|
John Frederick George Grant
|
30 November, 1835
|
|
6 September
|
37
|
|
Mervyn Bradford Medlycott, F.R.G.S.
|
20 September, 1837
|
|
1 November
|
38
|
|
Henry Forster Cleveland
|
28 April, 1837
|
|
26 November
|
38
|
|
Charles Compton Rising
|
4 November, 1841
|
|
10 December
|
34
|
|
Charles Edward Foot, F.R.G.S.
|
29 July, 1841
|
|
31 December
|
34
|
|
Officers promoted to the rank of Captain in 1876
|
Compton Edward Domvile
|
10 October, 1842
|
|
27 March
|
33
|
|
Francis Durrant
|
24 June, 1837
|
|
15 May
|
38
|
|
Frederick George Denham Bedford
|
28 December, 1838
|
|
15 May
|
37
|
|
Edmund St. John Garforth
|
7 May, 1836
|
|
18 August
|
40
|
|
Andrew James Kennedy
|
20 January, 1834
|
|
13 October
|
42
|
|
John Fiot Lee Pearse Maclear
|
27 June, 1838
|
|
13 October
|
38
|
|
Charles Johnson Vidal
|
11 July, 1838
|
|
13 October
|
38
|
|
Albert Hastings Markham, F.R.G.S.
|
11 November, 1841
|
|
3 November
|
34
|
|
Samuel Long
|
5 January, 1840
|
|
12 December
|
36
|
|
Guy Ouchterlony Twiss
|
19 October 1834
|
|
31 December
|
42
|
|
Thomas Harvey Royse
|
16 December, 1835
|
|
31 December
|
41
|
|
Alfred Taylor Dale
|
26 September, 1840
|
|
31 December
|
36
|
|
Officers promoted to the rank of Captain in 1877
|
Claude Edward Buckle
|
7 February, 1839
|
|
22 January
|
37
|
|
Arthur Cecil Curtis
|
27 February, 1836
|
|
16 February
|
40
|
|
Richard Duckworth King
|
16 July, 1840
|
|
16 February
|
36
|
|
THE HONOURABLE Victor Alexander Montagu
|
20 April, 1841
|
|
24 February
|
35
|
|
Henry Hand
|
9 September, 1834
|
|
18 April
|
42
|
|
Harry Holdsworth Rawson
|
5 November, 1843
|
|
4 June
|
33
|
|
Harry Nelson Hippisley
|
15 October, 1839
|
|
9 August
|
37
|
|
Richard George Kinahan
|
22 January, 1837
|
|
9 August
|
40
|
|
Francis Richard Blackburne
|
5 November, 1835
|
|
25 August
|
41
|
|
Robert Hornby Boyle
|
11 October, 1840
|
|
25 August
|
36
|
|
Richard Henry Napier
|
11 March, 1836
|
|
1 September
|
41
|
|
Cyprian Arthur George Bridge
|
15 March, 1839
|
|
17 September
|
38
|
|
Edmund Charles Drummond
|
4 August, 1841
|
|
31 December
|
36
|
|
Officers promoted to the rank of Captain in 1878
|
Charles Searle Cardale
|
21 April, 1841
|
|
9 January
|
36
|
|
Edmund John Church
|
14 February, 1842
|
|
9 January
|
35
|
|
Walter Stewart
|
13 July, 1841
|
|
9 January
|
36
|
|
John Reginald Thomas Fullerton
|
10 August, 1840
|
|
10 January
|
37
|
|
Charles Barstow Theobald
|
5 August, 1843
|
|
25 March
|
34
|
|
Henry St. Leger Bury Palliser
|
22 June, 1839
|
|
25 March
|
38
|
|
Uvedale Corbet Singleton
|
14 September, 1838
|
|
25 March
|
39
|
|
Ernest Rice
|
24 February, 1840
|
|
25 March
|
38
|
|
Frederick Samuel Vander-Meulen
|
20 November, 1839
|
|
25 March
|
38
|
|
Hilary Gustavus Andoe, C.B
|
19 February, 1841
|
|
25 March
|
37
|
|
Arthur Thomas Brooke, F.R.G.S.
|
6 June, 1838
|
|
14 August
|
40
|
|
Arthur Edward Dupuis
|
8 October, 1838
|
|
31 December
|
40
|
|
Armand Temple Powlett
|
17 May, 1841
|
|
31 December
|
37
|
|
Alexander Plantagenet Hastings
|
31 October, 1844
|
|
31 December
|
34
|
|
Officers promoted to the rank of Captain in 1879
|
THE HONOURABLE Richard Hare
|
25 August, 1836
|
|
4 February
|
42
|
|
Robert Woodward
|
7 November, 1838
|
|
4 February
|
40
|
|
Rodney Maclaine Lloyd
|
3 July, 1841
|
|
4 February
|
37
|
|
George John Anstruther
|
4 December, 1842
|
|
4 February
|
36
|
|
Francis Starkie Clayton
|
19 July, 1839
|
|
27 February
|
39
|
|
Henry John Fletcher Campbell, C.B.
|
16 November, 1837
|
|
3 July
|
41
|
|
John Graham Job Hanmer
|
31 July, 1836
|
|
3 July
|
42
|
4 November, 1886
|
Arthur Hildebrand Alington
|
10 October, 1839
|
|
31 October
|
40
|
|
Archer John William Musgrave
|
7 May, 1842
|
20 May, 1892
|
31 October
|
37
|
—
|
Henry John Carr
|
6 July, 1839
|
|
31 October
|
40
|
|
Charles Lister Oxley
|
17 October, 1841
|
|
31 October
|
38
|
|
Robert Hastings Harris
|
12 October, 1843
|
|
9 December
|
36
|
|
Hugo Lewis Pearson
|
30 June, 1843
|
|
9 December
|
36
|
|
Noel Stephen Fox Digby
|
2 October, 1839
|
18 January, 1920
|
31 December
|
40
|
30 May, 1893
|